VT H0599 | 2023-2024 | Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - House message: Governor approved bill on February 20, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to retroactively reinstating 10 V.S.A. §Â 6081(b)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to retroactively reinstating 10 V.S.A. §Â 6081(b)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-23SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on February 20, 2024
2024-02-20HouseSigned by Governor on February 20, 2024
2024-02-14HouseDelivered to the Governor on February 14, 2024
2024-02-09HouseSenate Message: Passed in concurrence
2024-02-08SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence
2024-02-08SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2024-02-07SenateReported favorably by Senator Watson for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
2024-02-07SenateFavorable report by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2024-02-07SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2024-02-06SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2024-02-06SenateSecond Reading
2024-02-06SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2024-01-23SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2024-01-18HouseRead third time and passed
2024-01-18HouseAction Calendar: Third Reading
2024-01-17HouseThird Reading ordered
2024-01-17HouseReport of Committee on Environment and Energy agreed to
2024-01-17HouseRep. Bongartz of Manchester reported for the Committee on Environment and Energy
2024-01-17HouseRead second time
2024-01-17HouseAction Calendar: Favorable with Amendment
2024-01-16HouseNotice Calendar: Favorable with Amendment
2024-01-03HouseRead first time and referred to the Committee on Environment and Energy

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback