VT H0582 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to increased funding for the Connectivity Initiative

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to increased funding for the Connectivity Initiative

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-16 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 136 to Pass -- Yeas = 109, Nays = 27 (Y: 109 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-22SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance
2018-02-20HousePassed
2018-02-20HouseRead Third time
2018-02-16HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-02-16HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 136 to Pass -- Yeas = 109, Nays = 27
2018-02-16HouseReport of Committee on Energy and Technology agreed to.
2018-02-16HouseRep. Young of Glover recommended for the committee on Ways and Means
2018-02-16HouseRep. Sibilia of Dover reported for the committee on Energy and Technology
2018-02-16HouseRead Second Time
2018-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
2018-01-09HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Energy and Technology

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback