VT H0582 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to increased funding for the Connectivity Initiative
Title
An act relating to increased funding for the Connectivity Initiative
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-16 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 136 to Pass -- Yeas = 109, Nays = 27 (Y: 109 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-02-20 | House | Passed |
2018-02-20 | House | Read Third time |
2018-02-16 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-02-16 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 136 to Pass -- Yeas = 109, Nays = 27 |
2018-02-16 | House | Report of Committee on Energy and Technology agreed to. |
2018-02-16 | House | Rep. Young of Glover recommended for the committee on Ways and Means |
2018-02-16 | House | Rep. Sibilia of Dover reported for the committee on Energy and Technology |
2018-02-16 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2018-01-09 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Energy and Technology |