VT H0581 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to Connectivity Initiative grant eligibility

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to Connectivity Initiative grant eligibility

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-22SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance
2018-02-20HousePassed
2018-02-20HouseRead Third time
2018-02-16HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-02-16HouseWhich was agreed to
2018-02-16HouseRep. Sibilia of Dover moved to amend the bill
2018-02-16HouseRep. Sibilia of Dover reported for the committee on Energy and Technology
2018-02-16HouseRead Second Time
2018-02-16HouseCalled Up on motion of Rep. Carr of Brandon and placed on the Calendar for Action on February 16, 2018
2018-02-06HouseOrdered to Lie upon motion of Rep. Carr of Brandon
2018-01-09HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Energy and Technology

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback