VT H0568 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to human trafficking and prostitution
Title
An act relating to human trafficking and prostitution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 126, Nays = 19 (Y: 126 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-02-21 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2020-02-20 | House | Second instance of amendment agreed to |
2020-02-20 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 126, Nays = 19 |
2020-02-20 | House | First Instance of amendment agreed to |
2020-02-20 | House | Rep. Harrison of Chittenden asked that the question be divided |
2020-02-20 | House | Rep. Conquest of Newbury reported for the committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-20 | House | Rep. Notte of Rutland City reported for the committee on Judiciary |
2020-02-20 | House | Read Second Time |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2020-01-07 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |