VT H0568 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - House message: Governor approved bill on March 1, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - House message: Governor approved bill on March 1, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to approval of amendments to the charter of the Town of Barre
Title
An act relating to approval of amendments to the charter of the Town of Barre
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on March 1, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed by Governor on March 1, 2018 |
2018-02-27 | House | Delivered to the Governor on 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2018-02-13 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-02-09 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2018-01-19 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2018-01-18 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-01-18 | House | Rep. LaClair of Barre Town reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2018-01-18 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-01-05 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |