VT H0566 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 1, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to animal cruelty

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to animal cruelty

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-01SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on May 1, 2018
2018-05-01HouseSigned by Governor on May 1, 2018
2018-04-19SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
2018-04-17HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2018-04-12HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-04-11SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-04-11SenateMotion agreed to
2018-04-11SenatePending third reading, motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment offered by Senator(s) Ashe
2018-04-11SenatePending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Ashe
2018-04-11SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-04-10Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-04-10SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2018-04-10SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary
2018-04-10SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-04-10SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-04-06SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-04-06SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-02-02SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-01-31HouseRead Third time and Passed
2018-01-30HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-01-30HouseReport of Committee on Judiciary agreed to.
2018-01-30HouseRep. Willhoit of St. Johnsbury reported for the committee on Judiciary
2018-01-30HouseRead Second Time
2018-01-05HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback