VT H0563 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - House message: Governor approved bill on April 18, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to repealing the crimes of vagrancy

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to repealing the crimes of vagrancy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on April 18, 2018
2018-04-18HouseSigned by Governor on April 18, 2018
2018-04-06SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
2018-04-05HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2018-04-05HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment considered
2018-04-03HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-03-30SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-03-30SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-03-29Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-03-29SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2018-03-29SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Benning for Committee on Judiciary
2018-03-29SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-03-29SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-03-28SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-03-28SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-01-26SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-01-24HouseRead Third time and Passed
2018-01-23HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-01-23HouseRep. Willhoit of St. Johnsbury reported for the committee on Judiciary
2018-01-23HouseRead Second Time
2018-01-04HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback