VT H0562 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Signed by Governor on May 22, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to parentage proceedings

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to parentage proceedings

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-06 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 141, Nays = 1 (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 70, Nays = 73 (Y: 70 N: 73 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22HouseSigned by Governor on May 22, 2018
2018-05-16HouseDelivered to the Governor on May 16, 2018
2018-05-09HouseCommittee of Conference report adopted (House bill)
2018-05-09HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2018-05-08HouseSenate message, report of committee of conference adopted
2018-05-08SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2018-05-08SenateCommittee of Conference report adopted
2018-05-08SenateCommittee of Conference report submitted by Senator Nitka for Committee, text
2018-05-08SenateCommittee of Conference Report
2018-05-07SenateNew Business/Committee of Conference Report
2018-05-05SenateCommittee of Conference Report
2018-05-05SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-04-17SenateCommittee of Conference appointed: Senators Nitka, Sears, and Benning
2018-04-13SenateHouse message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed
2018-04-12HouseSpeaker appointed Lalonde of South Burlington, Grad of Moretown and Dickinson of St. Albans Town as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House
2018-04-12HouseWhich was agreed to
2018-04-12HouseRep. Lalonde of South Burlington moved the House refuse to concur and asked for a committee of conference
2018-04-10HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-04-06SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-04-06SenateMotion agreed to
2018-04-06SenatePending third reading, Senator(s) White motion to amend proposal of amendment; text
2018-04-06SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) White
2018-04-06SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-04-05Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-04-05SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2018-04-05SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Nitka for Committee on Judiciary
2018-04-05SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-04-05SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-04-04SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-04-04SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-02-08SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-02-06HouseRead Third time and Passed
2018-02-06HouseWhich was agreed to
2018-02-06HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 141, Nays = 1
2018-02-06HouseRep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the bill
2018-02-06HouseWhich was agreed to
2018-02-06HouseRep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the bill
2018-02-06HouseWhich was disagreed to
2018-02-06HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 70, Nays = 73
2018-02-06HouseRep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the bill
2018-02-06HouseWhich was disagreed to
2018-02-06HouseRep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the bill
2018-02-06HouseWhich was disagreed to
2018-02-06HouseRep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the bill
2018-02-02HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-02-02HouseReport of Committee on Judiciary agreed to.
2018-02-02HouseRep. Grad of Moretown reported for the committee on Judiciary
2018-02-02HouseRead Second Time
2018-01-03HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback