VT H0551 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 27, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 27, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to prohibiting racially and religiously restrictive covenants in deeds
Title
An act relating to prohibiting racially and religiously restrictive covenants in deeds
Sponsors
Rep. Maxine Grad [D] | Rep. Kevin Christie [D] | Rep. Selene Colburn [D] | Rep. Harold Colston [D] |
Rep. Emilie Kornheiser [D] | Rep. Martin LaLonde [D] | Rep. Barbara Rachelson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Senate - Roll Call, requested by Senator Benning, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 27, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Signed by Governor on May 27, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 23, 2022 |
2022-05-09 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-06 | House | Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2022-05-06 | House | Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-05 | House | Notice Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-04 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-05-04 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Roll Call, requested by Senator Benning, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Benning for Committee on Judiciary |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-29 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-17 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2022-03-17 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-03-16 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-03-16 | House | Report of Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2022-03-16 | House | Rep. Mattos of Milton recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-03-16 | House | Rep. Grad of Moretown reported for the Committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-16 | House | Read Second time |
2022-03-16 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-03-15 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-03-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2022-03-11 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-01-11 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary |