VT H0550 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-29 - House message: Governor approved bill on April 29, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to unclaimed property

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to unclaimed property

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-29SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on April 29, 2020
2020-04-27HouseDelivered to the Governor on April 27, 2020
2020-03-11SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
2020-03-10HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2020-02-26HouseAction postponed until March 10, 2020 as moved by Rep. Marcotte of Coventry
2020-02-21HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2020-02-20SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2020-02-20SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2020-02-19Senate3rd reading ordered
2020-02-19SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to
2020-02-19SenateReported favorably by Senator McCormack for Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-19SenateReported favorably by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations with proposal of amendment
2020-02-19SenateRead 2nd time
2020-02-19SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-19SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2020-02-19SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2020-02-18SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-18SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2020-02-18SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2020-01-31SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2020-01-31SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Government Operations per Temporary Senate Rule 44A
2019-05-03SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules
2019-05-01HousePassed
2019-05-01HouseRead Third time
2019-04-30HouseThird Reading Ordered
2019-04-30HouseRep. O'Sullivan of Burlington spoke for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development
2019-04-30HouseRead Second Time
2019-04-26HouseCommittee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on April 26, 2019

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback