VT H0547 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to approval of an amendment to the charter of the City of Montpelier

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to approval of an amendment to the charter of the City of Montpelier

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21HouseSenate Message, Passed in Concurrence
2019-05-21SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2019-05-21SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence
2019-05-21SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2019-05-20SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2019-05-17SenateReported favorably by Senator Pollina for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
2019-05-17SenateFavorable report by Committee on Government Operations
2019-05-17SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2019-05-16SenateFavorable report by Committee on Government Operations
2019-05-16SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-05-15SenateReferred to Committee on Government Operations per Temporary Senate Rule 44A
2019-05-15SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules
2019-05-14HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2019-05-14HouseRead Third time and Passed
2019-05-13HouseThird Reading Ordered
2019-05-13HouseReport of Committee on Government Operations agreed to.
2019-05-13HouseRep. Kitzmiller of Montpelier reported for the committee on Government Operations
2019-05-13HouseRead Second Time
2019-05-13HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2019-04-09HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback