VT H0540 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 23, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to approval of the amendments to the charter of the Town of Williston

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to approval of the amendments to the charter of the Town of Williston

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on May 23, 2019
2019-05-23HouseSigned by Governor on May 23, 2019
2019-05-17HouseDelivered to the Governor on May 17, 2019
2019-05-14HouseSenate Message, Passed in Concurrence
2019-05-14SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza
2019-05-14SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence
2019-05-14SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2019-05-13SenateReported favorably by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
2019-05-13SenateFavorable report by Committee on Government Operations
2019-05-13SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2019-05-10SenateFavorable report by Committee on Government Operations
2019-05-10SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-05-06SenateReferred to Committee on Government Operations per Temporary Senate Rule 44A
2019-04-17SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules
2019-04-12HouseRead Third time and Passed
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading Ordered
2019-04-11HouseRep. Palasik of Milton reported for the committee on Government Operations
2019-04-11HouseRead Second Time
2019-03-26HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback