VT H0531 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to Vermont’s child care and early learning system
Title
An act relating to Vermont’s child care and early learning system
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 67 of 133 to Pass -- Yeas = 133, Nays = 0 (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-03-27 | House | Passed |
2019-03-27 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 67 of 133 to Pass -- Yeas = 133, Nays = 0 |
2019-03-27 | House | Read Third time |
2019-03-26 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-03-26 | House | Recommendation of Amendment of the Committee on Appropriations agreed to |
2019-03-26 | House | Rep. Trieber of Rockingham recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-26 | House | Rep. Wood of Waterbury spoke for the committee on Human Services |
2019-03-26 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee Bill read first time |