VT H0530 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 15 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the qualifications and election of the Adjutant and Inspector General

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the qualifications and election of the Adjutant and Inspector General

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-22 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 123, Nays = 15 (Y: 123 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2019-05-16SenateCommittee of Conference appointed: Senators White, Collamore, and Pollina
2019-05-16SenateHouse message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed
2019-05-16HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2019-05-16HouseSpeaker appointed Troiano of Stannard, Stevens of Waterbury and Hango of Berkshire as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House
2019-05-16HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Stevens of Waterbury
2019-05-16HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2019-05-15HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2019-05-15SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza
2019-05-15SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2019-05-15SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2019-05-14Senate3rd reading ordered
2019-05-14SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to
2019-05-14SenateReported favorably by Senator Nitka for Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-14SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations
2019-05-14SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-14SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2019-05-14SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2019-05-13SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-13SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2019-05-13SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-05-09SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2019-05-09SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2019-05-09SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-03-28SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations
2019-03-26HouseRead Third time and Passed
2019-03-22HouseThird Reading Ordered
2019-03-22HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 123, Nays = 15
2019-03-22HouseWhich was agreed to
2019-03-22HouseRep. Fagan of Rutland City moved to amend the bill
2019-03-22HouseReport of Committee on Appropriations agreed to.
2019-03-22HouseRep. Helm of Fair Haven recommended for the committee on Appropriations
2019-03-22HouseRep. Stevens of Waterbury spoke for the committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs
2019-03-22HouseRead Second Time
2019-03-19HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2019-03-19HouseCommittee Bill read first time

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback