VT H0528 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 16, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 16, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the Rural Health Services Task Force
Title
An act relating to the Rural Health Services Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 16, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | House | Signed by Governor on May 16, 2019 |
2019-05-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 10, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2019-05-07 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2019-05-03 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) McCormack motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-02 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator McCormack for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-05-01 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-03-22 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2019-03-21 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-03-21 | House | Rep. Rogers of Waterville, Christensen of Weathersfield, Cina of Burlington, Cordes of Lincoln, Demrow of Corinth, Donahue of Northfield, Durfee of Shaftsbury, Houghton of Essex, Jickling of Randolph, Lippert of Hinesburg, Page of Newport City, and Smith of New Haven moved to amend the bill which was agreed to |
2019-03-21 | House | Rep. Rogers of Waterville spoke for the committee on Health Care |
2019-03-21 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-03-20 | House | Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on March 20, 2019 |