VT H0524 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 17, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 17, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to health insurance and the individual mandate
Title
An act relating to health insurance and the individual mandate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 136 to Pass -- Yeas = 92, Nays = 44 (Y: 92 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 50, Nays = 87 (Y: 50 N: 87 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2019-03-28 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 50, Nays = 87 (Y: 50 N: 87 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on June 17, 2019 |
2019-06-17 | House | Signed by Governor on June 17, 2019 |
2019-06-11 | House | Delivered to the Governor on June 11, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text |
2019-05-22 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-21 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment |
2019-05-20 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-17 | House | Which was agreed to |
2019-05-17 | House | Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg moved to concur in the Senate prop of amend with a further amend thereto |
2019-05-17 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment considered |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-15 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Pearson for Committee on Finance |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2019-05-14 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-03-29 | House | Passed |
2019-03-29 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 136 to Pass -- Yeas = 92, Nays = 44 |
2019-03-29 | House | Read Third time |
2019-03-28 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-03-28 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2019-03-28 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 50, Nays = 87 |
2019-03-28 | House | Rep. Harrison of Chittenden moved to amend the bill |
2019-03-28 | House | Rep. Harrison of Chittenden asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2019-03-28 | House | Rep. Harrison of Chittenden moved to amend the bill |
2019-03-28 | House | Report of Committee on Ways and Means agreed to. |
2019-03-28 | House | Report of Committee on Appropriations agreed to. |
2019-03-28 | House | Rep. Lanpher of Vergennes recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-28 | House | Rep. Till of Jericho recommended for the committee on Ways and Means |
2019-03-28 | House | Rep. Houghton of Essex spoke for the committee on Health Care |
2019-03-28 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-03-27 | House | Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Houghton of Essex |
2019-03-21 | House | Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg moved to commit bill to the committee on Appropriations which was agreed to. |
2019-03-21 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg |
2019-03-15 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means |