VT H0523 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-03 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary per Temporary Senate Rule 44A
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to fair and impartial policing

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to fair and impartial policing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-12 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 124, Nays = 21 (Y: 124 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-03SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary per Temporary Senate Rule 44A
2017-04-18SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules
2017-04-13HousePassed
2017-04-13HouseRead Third time
2017-04-12HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 124, Nays = 21
2017-04-12HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-04-12HouseRep. Morris of Bennington spoke for the committee on Judiciary
2017-04-12HouseRead Second Time
2017-04-07HouseCommittee Bill read first time

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback