VT H0512 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Signed by Governor on 5/13/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Signed by Governor on 5/13/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Approval Of Amendments To The Charter Of The City Of Barre
Title
An Act Relating To Approval Of Amendments To The Charter Of The City Of Barre
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Signed by Governor on 5/13/2013 |
2013-05-08 | House | Passed the House and Senate on 5/8/2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2013-05-08 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Pollina for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2013-05-07 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Committee on Rules relieved; bill committed to Committee on Government Operations on motion of Senator Baruth |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-04-17 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2013-04-16 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2013-04-11 | House | Rep. Rep. Higley of Lowell reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2013-04-16 | House | Read Second Time |
2013-04-10 | House | Action postponed until 4/16/2013 as moved by Rep. Higley of Lowell |
2013-03-14 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |