VT H0511 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to criminal statutes of limitations
Title
An act relating to criminal statutes of limitations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | House | Signed by Governor on May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | House message House adopted Conference Committee report |
2019-05-17 | House | Committee of Conference report adopted (House bill) |
2019-05-17 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-17 | House | Senate message, report of committee of conference adopted |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Benning for Committee, text |
2019-05-17 | Senate | New Business/Committee of Conference Report |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Committee of Conference Report |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Benning, Nitka, and Sears |
2019-05-08 | Senate | House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed |
2019-05-08 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-07 | House | Speaker appointed LaLonde of South Burlington, Grad of Moretown and Burditt of West Rutland as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2019-05-07 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. LaLonde of South Burlington |
2019-05-02 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Sears, Benning, Baruth, Nitka, and White agreed to |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Consideration resumed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Pearson, Balint, Clarkson, Hardy, and Ingram |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Consideration Postponed/Third Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Consideration postponed to Wednesday, May 1, 2019 on motion of Senator Sears |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Pearson, Balint, Bray, Clarkson, Hardy, and Ingram |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Consideration postponed to Wednesday, May 1, 2019 |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Pending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Pearson, Balint, Bray, Clarkson, Hardy, and Ingram |
2019-04-26 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-04-25 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-25 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-13 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2019-03-12 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-03-12 | House | Rep. LaLonde of South Burlington spoke for the committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-12 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-03-01 | House | Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on March 1, 2019 |