VT H0511 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Signed by Governor on 4/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To Automated Sales Suppression Devices, Also Known As "zappers"

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To Automated Sales Suppression Devices, Also Known As "zappers"

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-29HouseSigned by Governor on 4/29/2013
2013-04-25HouseDelivered to the Governor on 4/25/2013
2013-04-19SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
2013-04-18HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2013-04-12SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2013-04-12SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2013-04-11Senate3rd reading ordered
2013-04-11SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary, as amended, agreed to
2013-04-11SenateSenator(s) Sears to substitute amendment agreed to
2013-04-11SenateSenator(s) Sears motion to substitute amendment for Committee on Judiciary recommendation of amendment; text
2013-04-11SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary
2013-04-11SenateSubstitute Recommendation/Proposal of amendment, by Committee on Judiciary
2013-04-11SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2013-04-11SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2013-04-10SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2013-04-10SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2013-04-09SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2013-04-09SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2013-03-22SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2013-03-20HouseRead Third time and Passed
2013-03-19HouseThird Reading Ordered
2013-03-15HouseRep. Rep. Goodwin of Weston spoke for the committee on Judiciary
2013-03-19HouseRead Second Time
2013-03-14HousePlaced on Calendar for Notice on 3/14/2013

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback