VT H0509 | 2023-2024 | Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Delivered to Secretary of State on June 23, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to approval of amendments to the voter qualification provisions of the charter of the City of Burlington

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to approval of amendments to the voter qualification provisions of the charter of the City of Burlington

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-20 - House - Veto of the Governor overriden by a vote of Yeas = 111, Nays = 36 (Y: 111 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-06-20 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 98 of 147 to Pass -- Yeas = 111, Nays = 36 (Y: 111 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Veto of Governor overridden on a roll call Yeas = 21, Nays = 9 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-10 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Collamore, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 21, Nays = 8 (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 105, Nays = 33 (Y: 105 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-20HouseDelivered to Secretary of State on June 23, 2023
2023-06-20HouseSenate Message: Governor's veto overridden
2023-06-20SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth
2023-06-20SenateVeto of Governor overridden on a roll call Yeas = 21, Nays = 9
2023-06-20SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth
2023-06-20SenateHouse message: Bill passed, the veto of the Governor notwithstanding
2023-06-20HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2023-06-20HouseVeto of the Governor overriden by a vote of Yeas = 111, Nays = 36
2023-06-20HouseRules suspended and taken up for immediate consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2023-06-20HouseNotice Calendar: Governor’s Veto
2023-05-12SenateHouse message: Governor vetoed bill on May 27, 2023
2023-05-12HouseVetoed by the Governor on May 27, 2023
2023-05-12HouseDelivered to the Governor on May 22, 2023
2023-05-12HouseSenate Message: Passed in concurrence
2023-05-11SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence
2023-05-11SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2023-05-10Senate3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Collamore, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 21, Nays = 8
2023-05-10SenateReported favorably by Senator Vyhovsky for Committee on Government Operations
2023-05-10SenateRead 2nd time
2023-05-10SenateFavorable report by Committee on Government Operations
2023-05-10SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2023-05-09SenateFavorable report by Committee on Government Operations
2023-05-09SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2023-05-08SenateReferred to Committee on Government Operations per Temporary Senate Rule 44A
2023-05-05SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules
2023-05-03HouseRead third time and passed
2023-05-03HouseAction Calendar: Third Reading
2023-05-02HouseThird Reading ordered
2023-05-02HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 105, Nays = 33
2023-05-02HouseRep. Toof of St. Albans Town demanded yeas and nays
2023-05-02HouseRep. Mrowicki of Putney reported for the Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs
2023-05-02HouseRead second time
2023-05-02HouseAction Calendar: Favorable
2023-05-01HouseAction Calendar: Favorable
2023-04-28HouseNotice Calendar: Favorable
2023-04-04HouseRead first time and referred to the Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback