VT H0501 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on June 3, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To Operating A Motor Vehicle Under The Influence Of Alcohol Or Drugs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To Operating A Motor Vehicle Under The Influence Of Alcohol Or Drugs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-06 - Senate - Shall the bill pass in concurrence with proposal of amendment? (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - Shall the bill be read a third time? (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-10HouseSigned by Governor on June 3, 2014
2014-05-10HouseRules Suspended and Action on the bill messaged to the Senate forthwith and the bill delivered to the Governor forthwith as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton.
2014-05-10SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth
2014-05-10SenateCommittee of Conference report adopted
2014-05-10SenateCommittee of Conference report submitted by Senator Nitka for Committee, text
2014-05-10SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth
2014-05-10HouseCommittee of Conference report agreed to (House bill)
2014-05-10HouseRep. Turner of Milton moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration
2014-05-08SenateCommittee of Conference appointed: Senators Nitka, Sears, and Benning
2014-05-07SenateHouse message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed
2014-05-07HouseSpeaker appointed Waite-Simpson of Essex, Koch of Barre Town and Potter of Clarendon as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House
2014-05-07HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Koch of Barre Town
2014-05-07HouseRep. Savage of Swanton moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration
2014-05-06SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth
2014-05-06SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth
2014-05-06SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 13 of 24 to Pass -- Yeas = 24, Nays = 0
2014-05-06SenateProposal of amendment agreed to
2014-05-06SenatePending third reading, Senator(s) Rodgers motion to amend proposal of amendment; text
2014-05-06HouseSenate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2014-05-06SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Rodgers
2014-05-06SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Baruth, Pollina, and Sirotkin
2014-05-06SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears
2014-05-06SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2014-05-05Senate3rd reading ordered
2014-05-05SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary, as amended, agreed to
2014-05-05SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary amended as moved by Senator(s) Sears
2014-05-05SenateProposal of amendment by Senator(s) Sears; text
2014-05-05SenatePoint of order on ground of lack of germaneness raised by Senator Galbraith sustained and Sec. 3 of the proposal of amendment of Judiciary striken
2014-05-05SenatePoint of order raised by Senator Galbraith on ground that proposed amendment was not germane
2014-05-05SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary
2014-05-05SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2014-05-05SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2014-05-03SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2014-05-02SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2014-03-18SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2014-03-13HousePassed
2014-03-13HouseRead Third time
2014-03-12HouseThird Reading Ordered
2014-03-12HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 138, Nays = 2
2014-03-12HouseAmendment of Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2014-03-12HouseRep. Waite-Simpson of Essex reported for the committee on Judiciary
2014-03-12HouseRead Second Time
2013-03-12HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback