VT H0497 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 10, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to health requirements for animals used in agriculture

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to health requirements for animals used in agriculture

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on May 10, 2017
2017-05-10HouseSigned by Governor on May 10, 2017
2017-04-28SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
2017-04-26HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2017-04-26HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment considered
2017-04-21HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2017-04-20SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2017-04-20SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-04-19Senate3rd reading ordered
2017-04-19SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture agreed to
2017-04-19SenateReported favorably by Senator Pollina for Committee on Finance
2017-04-19SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Brooks for Committee on Agriculture
2017-04-19SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2017-04-19SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture
2017-04-19SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2017-04-18SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2017-04-18SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture
2017-04-18SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2017-04-17SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2017-04-17SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture
2017-04-17SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2017-04-14SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2017-04-14SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture
2017-04-05SenateReferred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
2017-04-05SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture
2017-03-14SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Agriculture
2017-03-03HouseRead Third time and Passed
2017-03-03HouseRules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
2017-03-03HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-03-03HouseRep. Higley of Lowell spoke for the committee on Agriculture & Forestry
2017-03-03HouseRead Second Time
2017-03-01HouseCommittee Bill read first time

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback