VT H0497 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Signed by Governor on May 26, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Signed by Governor on May 26, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to approval of amendments to the charter of the Town of Colchester
Title
An act relating to approval of amendments to the charter of the Town of Colchester
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | House | Signed by Governor on May 26, 2015 |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Lyons for Committee on Finance, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2015-05-15 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Government Operations per Temporary Senate Rule 44A |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2015-05-05 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2015-05-05 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2015-05-05 | House | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2015-05-05 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2015-05-05 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations agreed to. |
2015-05-05 | House | Rep. Condon of Colchester, recommended for the committee on Ways & Means |
2015-05-05 | House | Rep. Lewis of Berlin reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2015-05-05 | House | Read Second Time |
2015-04-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways & Means per Rule 35(a) |
2015-04-03 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |