VT H0493 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to relief from abuse orders

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to relief from abuse orders

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-14SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-03HouseRead Third time and Passed
2017-03-02HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-03-02HouseRep. Morris of Bennington spoke for the committee on Judiciary
2017-03-02HouseRead Second Time
2017-02-28HouseCommittee Bill read first time

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback