VT H0482 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 19, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 19, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to Vermont Criminal Justice Council recommendations for law enforcement officer training
Title
An act relating to Vermont Criminal Justice Council recommendations for law enforcement officer training
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-20 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on June 19, 2023 |
2023-05-12 | House | Signed by Governor on June 19, 2023 |
2023-05-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on June 13, 2023 |
2023-05-10 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2023-05-08 | House | Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2023-05-08 | House | Action Calendar: Senate Proposal of Amendment |
2023-05-06 | House | Action Calendar: Senate Proposal of Amendment |
2023-05-05 | House | Notice Calendar: Senate Proposal of Amendment |
2023-05-04 | House | Senate Message: Passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2023-05-04 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2023-05-03 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Norris for Committee on Government Operations |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2023-05-03 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2023-03-24 | House | Read third time and passed |
2023-03-24 | House | Action Calendar: Third Reading |
2023-03-23 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2023-03-23 | House | Rep. Waters Evans of Charlotte reported for the Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs |
2023-03-23 | House | Read second time |
2023-03-23 | House | Action Calendar: Committee bill for second reading |
2023-03-22 | House | Notice Calendar: Committee bill for second reading |
2023-03-21 | House | Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on March 22, 2023 |