VT H0470 | 2023-2024 | Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 14, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to miscellaneous amendments to alcoholic beverage laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to miscellaneous amendments to alcoholic beverage laws

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-20SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on June 14, 2023
2023-05-12HouseSigned by Governor on June 14, 2023
2023-05-12HouseDelivered to the Governor on June 8, 2023
2023-05-12HouseSenate Message: House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in
2023-05-11SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth
2023-05-11SenateHouse proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in
2023-05-11SenateHouse proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text
2023-05-11SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth
2023-05-11SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment
2023-05-11HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2023-05-11HouseSenate proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Birong of Vergennes
2023-05-11HouseAction Calendar: Senate Proposal of Amendment
2023-05-10HouseNotice Calendar: Senate Proposal of Amendment
2023-05-09HouseSenate Message: Passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2023-05-09SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth
2023-05-09SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2023-05-09SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2023-05-08Senate3rd reading ordered
2023-05-08SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs, as amended, agreed to
2023-05-08SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs amended as recommended by Committee on Finance
2023-05-08SenateReported favorably by Senator Brock for Committee on Finance with proposal of amendment
2023-05-08SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Clarkson for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2023-05-08SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
2023-05-08SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2023-05-08SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2023-05-05SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
2023-05-05SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2023-05-05SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2023-05-02SenateReferred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
2023-05-02SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2023-05-02SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2023-03-23SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2023-03-21HouseRead third time and passed
2023-03-21HouseAction Calendar: Third Reading
2023-03-17HouseThird Reading ordered
2023-03-17HouseRep. Birong of Vergennes spoke for the Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs
2023-03-17HouseRead second time
2023-03-17HouseAction Calendar: Committee bill for second reading
2023-03-16HouseNotice Calendar: Committee bill for second reading
2023-03-15HouseCommittee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on March 16, 2023

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback