VT H0444 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 24, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 24, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to approval of amendments to the charter of the City of Barre
Title
An act relating to approval of amendments to the charter of the City of Barre
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 24, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Signed by Governor on May 24, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 18, 2022 |
2022-05-07 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza |
2022-05-06 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2022-05-06 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text |
2022-05-06 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-05-05 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-05-04 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment |
2022-05-03 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2022-05-03 | House | Which was agreed to |
2022-05-03 | House | Rep. Anthony of Barre City moved to concur in the Senate proposal of amendment with a further amendment thereto |
2022-05-03 | House | Senate proposal of amendment considered |
2022-05-03 | House | Action Calendar: Amendment offered by Rep Anthony of Barre City |
2022-05-03 | House | Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-02 | House | Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-04-29 | House | Notice Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-04-06 | House | Rep. Anthony of Barre City moved to commit bill to the Committee on Government Operations which was agreed to |
2022-04-06 | House | Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-04-01 | House | Rep. Anthony of Barre City moved to postpone action until April 6, 2022 which was agreed to |
2022-03-31 | House | Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-03-31 | House | Action postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Anthony of Barre City |
2022-03-31 | House | Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-03-29 | House | Rep. Copeland Hanzas of Bradford moved to postpone action until March 31, 2022 which was agreed to |
2022-03-29 | House | Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-03-25 | House | Notice Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-03-24 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2022-03-18 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-03-17 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Pollina for Committee on Government Operations |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-03-09 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Government Operations per Temporary Senate Rule 44A |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-05-19 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2021-05-19 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2021-05-18 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2021-05-18 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2021-05-18 | House | Rep. Anthony of Barre City reported for the Committee on Government Operations |
2021-05-18 | House | Read Second time |
2021-04-07 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Government Operations |