VT H0439 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the Home Weatherization Assistance Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the Home Weatherization Assistance Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 69 of 136 to Pass -- Yeas = 19, Nays = 117 (Y: 19 N: 117 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 16, Nays = 122 (Y: 16 N: 122 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 74, Nays = 66 (Y: 74 N: 66 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 38, Nays = 102 (Y: 38 N: 102 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 81, Nays = 60 (Y: 81 N: 60 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 51, Nays = 90 (Y: 51 N: 90 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance
2019-03-27HouseRead Third time and Passed
2019-03-27HouseWhich was disagreed to
2019-03-27HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 69 of 136 to Pass -- Yeas = 19, Nays = 117
2019-03-27HouseRep. Leffler of Enosburgh moved to amend the bill
2019-03-27HouseWhich was disagreed to
2019-03-27HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 16, Nays = 122
2019-03-27HouseRep. Browning of Arlington moved to amend the bill
2019-03-27HouseAmendment of Rep. Leffler of Enosburgh ruled not germane
2019-03-27HouseRep. Bartholomew of Hartland raised a Point of Order
2019-03-27HouseRep. Leffler of Enosburgh moved to amend the bill
2019-03-27HouseWhich was agreed to
2019-03-27HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 74, Nays = 66
2019-03-27HouseRep. Graham of Williamstown moved to amend the bill
2019-03-27HouseWhich was disagreed to
2019-03-27HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 38, Nays = 102
2019-03-27HouseRep. Mattos of Milton moved to amend the bill
2019-03-27HouseWhich was disagreed to
2019-03-27HouseRep. Chesnut-Tangerman of Middletown Springs and Yacovone of Morristown moved to amend the bill
2019-03-26HouseThird Reading Ordered
2019-03-26HouseReport of Committee on Ways and Means agreed to.
2019-03-26HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 81, Nays = 60
2019-03-26HouseWhich was disagreed to
2019-03-26HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 51, Nays = 90
2019-03-26HouseRep. Leffler of Enosburgh moved to commit the bill to the committee on Energy and Technology
2019-03-26HouseRep. Browning of Arlington asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment
2019-03-26HouseAmendment offered by Rep. Browning of Arlington in Sec. 1 and 2 ruled not germane
2019-03-26HouseRep. McCarthy of St. Albans City raised a Point of Order
2019-03-26HouseRep. Bartholomew of Hartland asked that the question be divided
2019-03-26HouseRep. Browning of Arlington moved to amend the report of the committee on Ways and Means
2019-03-26HouseRep. Masland of Thetford reported for the committee on Ways and Means
2019-03-26HouseRead Second Time
2019-03-22HouseAction Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Masland of Thetford
2019-02-26HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback