VT H0431 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Signed by Governor on June 3, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to miscellaneous energy subjects

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to miscellaneous energy subjects

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-21HouseSigned by Governor on June 3, 2021
2021-05-21HouseDelivered to the Governor on May 28, 2021
2021-05-20HouseSenate proposal of amendment concurred in
2021-05-20HouseRules suspended and taken up for immediate consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2021-05-19HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2021-05-19SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint
2021-05-19SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2021-05-19SenatePending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Perchlik
2021-05-19SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2021-05-18Senate3rd reading ordered
2021-05-18SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to
2021-05-18SenateReported favorably by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations
2021-05-18SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Pearson for Committee on Finance
2021-05-18SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2021-05-18SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
2021-05-18SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2021-05-14SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2021-05-14SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
2021-05-14SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2021-05-13SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2021-05-13SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
2021-05-13SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2021-03-25SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance
2021-03-23HouseRead Third time and Passed
2021-03-19HouseThird Reading Ordered
2021-03-19HouseRep. Kornheiser of Brattleboro recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means
2021-03-19HouseRep. Sims of Craftsbury reported for the Committee on Energy and Technology
2021-03-19HouseRead Second Time
2021-03-16HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
2021-03-16HouseCommittee bill read first time

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback