VT H0431 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-26 - Signed by Governor on 4/26/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-26 - Signed by Governor on 4/26/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Mediation In Foreclosure Actions
Title
An Act Relating To Mediation In Foreclosure Actions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-26 | House | Signed by Governor on 4/26/2013 |
2013-04-25 | House | Delivered to the Governor on 4/25/2013 |
2013-04-16 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2013-04-17 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2013-04-10 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2013-04-09 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Ashe for Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-09 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-03-20 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2013-03-19 | House | Amendment of Committee on Judiciary agreed to and Third Reading Ordered |
2013-03-19 | House | Read Second Time |
2013-03-15 | House | Rep. Rep. Koch of Barre Town reported for the committee on Judiciary |
2013-03-01 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |