VT H0428 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to hate-motivated crimes and misconduct
Title
An act relating to hate-motivated crimes and misconduct
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Baruth, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 1 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-05-19 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 18, 2021 |
2021-05-18 | House | Signed by Governor on May 18, 2021 |
2021-05-17 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 17, 2021 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2021-05-11 | House | Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2021-05-06 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Baruth, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 1 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2021-05-04 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Baruth for Committee on Judiciary |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-04-30 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-03-18 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2021-03-17 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2021-03-17 | House | Rep. Christie of Hartford spoke for the Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-17 | House | Read Second time |
2021-03-12 | House | Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on March 16, 2021 |