VT H0424 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 23, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the Commission on Act 250: the Next 50 Years

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the Commission on Act 250: the Next 50 Years

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on May 23, 2017
2017-05-23HouseSigned by Governor on May 23, 2017
2017-05-17HouseDelivered to the Governor on May 17, 2017
2017-05-05SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
2017-05-04HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2017-05-04HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2017-05-04HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment considered
2017-05-02HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2017-05-02SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2017-05-02SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2017-05-02SenateProposal of amendment agreed to
2017-05-02SenatePending third reading, Senator(s) Rodgers, Bray, Campion, MacDonald, and Pearson motion to amend proposal of amendment; text
2017-05-02SenateSenator Rodgers requested & granted leave to withdraw amendment
2017-05-02SenateConsideration resumed
2017-05-02SenateConsideration postponed to 2:00pm on motion of Senator Ashe
2017-05-02SenateQuestion divided on demand of Senator Rodgers
2017-05-02SenatePending third reading, Senator(s) Rodgers motion to amend proposal of amendment; text
2017-05-02SenateProposal of amendment agreed to
2017-05-02SenatePending third reading, Senator(s) Pearson, Ashe, Baruth, Ingram, Lyons, Sirotkin, and Bray motion to amend proposal of amendment; text
2017-05-02SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-05-01Senate3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Bray, Passed -- Needed 14 of 26 to Pass -- Yeas = 26, Nays = 0
2017-05-01SenateProposal of amendment  by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, as amended, agreed to
2017-05-01SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations
2017-05-01SenateReported favorably by Senator Nitka for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment
2017-05-01SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator MacDonald for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2017-05-01SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2017-05-01SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2017-05-01SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2017-04-28SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2017-04-28SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2017-04-24SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2017-04-24SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2017-03-31SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2017-03-29HouseRead Third time and Passed
2017-03-28HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-03-28HouseReport of Committee on Natural Resources, Fish & Wildlife as amended agreed to
2017-03-28HouseReport of the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish & Wildlife amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations
2017-03-28HouseRep. Feltus of Lyndon recommended for the committee on Appropriations
2017-03-28HouseRep. Sullivan of Burlington reported for the committee on Natural Resources, Fish & Wildlife
2017-03-28HouseRead Second Time
2017-03-21HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2017-02-23HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish & Wildlife

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback