VT H0422 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - House message: Governor approved bill on April 11, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to removal of firearms from a person arrested or cited for domestic assault

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to removal of firearms from a person arrested or cited for domestic assault

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on April 11, 2018
2018-04-11HouseSigned by Governor on April 11, 2018
2018-04-06HouseDelivered to the Governor on April 6, 2018
2018-04-06SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
2018-04-05HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2018-04-05HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 67 of 133 to Pass -- Yeas = 133, Nays = 0
2018-04-05HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment considered
2018-04-03HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-03-30SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-03-30SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-03-29Senate3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0
2018-03-29SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2018-03-29SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary
2018-03-29SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-03-29SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-03-28SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-03-28SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2017-03-23SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-22HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 78, Nays = 60
2017-03-22HousePassed
2017-03-22HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Wright of Burlington disagreed to
2017-03-22HouseRep. Wright of Burlington moved to amend the bill
2017-03-22HouseWhich was agreed to
2017-03-22HouseRep. Wright of Burlington asked permission to offer an amendment after third reading
2017-03-22HouseRead Third time
2017-03-21HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-03-21HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 78, Nays = 67
2017-03-21HouseReport of Committee on Judiciary agreed to.
2017-03-21HouseRep. Conquest of Newbury reported for the committee on Judiciary
2017-03-21HouseRead Second Time
2017-02-23HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/status/2018/H.422
Texthttp://legislature.vermont.gov/assets/Documents/2018/Docs/BILLS/H-0422/H-0422%20As%20Introduced.pdf
Texthttp://legislature.vermont.gov/assets/Documents/2018/Docs/BILLS/H-0422/H-0422%20As%20Passed%20by%20the%20House%20Official.pdf
Texthttp://legislature.vermont.gov/assets/Documents/2018/Docs/BILLS/H-0422/H-0422%20As%20Passed%20by%20Both%20House%20and%20Senate%20Official.pdf
Texthttp://legislature.vermont.gov/assets/Documents/2018/Docs/ACTS/ACT092/ACT092%20As%20Enacted.pdf
Roll Callhttp://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2018/23
Roll Callhttp://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2018/26
Roll Callhttp://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2018/220
Roll Callhttp://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2018/229

Bill Comments

feedback