VT H0399 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 5, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 5, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to incarceration terms for criminal defendants who are primary caretakers of dependent children
Title
An act relating to incarceration terms for criminal defendants who are primary caretakers of dependent children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 5, 2022 |
2022-05-05 | House | Signed by Governor on May 5, 2022 |
2022-04-29 | House | Delivered to the Governor on April 29, 2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2022-04-22 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Benning for Committee on Judiciary, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-21 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-17 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2022-03-17 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-03-16 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-03-16 | House | Report of Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2022-03-16 | House | Rep. Donnally of Hyde Park reported for the Committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-16 | House | Read Second time |
2022-03-16 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-03-15 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2021-03-09 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary |