VT H0394 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-11)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Signed by Governor on April 23, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the disposition of the remains of veterans

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the disposition of the remains of veterans

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23HouseSigned by Governor on April 23, 2019
2019-04-17HouseDelivered to the Governor on April 17, 2019
2019-04-23SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on April 23, 2019
2019-04-12SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
2019-04-11HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2019-04-05HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2019-04-04SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2019-04-04SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2019-04-03Senate3rd reading ordered
2019-04-03SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to
2019-04-03SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations
2019-04-03SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2019-04-03SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2019-04-02SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2019-04-02SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2019-03-29SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2019-03-29SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2019-03-28SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2019-03-28SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-03-22SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations
2019-03-20HouseRead Third time and Passed
2019-03-19HouseThird Reading Ordered
2019-03-19HouseReport of Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs agreed to.
2019-03-19HouseRep. Troiano of Stannard reported for the committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs
2019-03-19HouseRead Second Time
2019-02-22HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback