VT H0386 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-12 - Referred to Committee on Finance per Temporary Senate Rule 44A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-12 - Referred to Committee on Finance per Temporary Senate Rule 44A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to home health agency provider taxes
Title
An act relating to home health agency provider taxes
Sponsors
Rep. Kathleen Keenan [D] | Rep. Maureen Dakin [D] | Rep. Peter Fagan [R] | Rep. Mary Hooper [D] |
Rep. Bernard Juskiewicz [R] | Rep. Diane Lanpher [D] | Rep. Carl Rosenquist [R] | Rep. David Yacovone [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Temporary Senate Rule 44A |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-03-29 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2017-03-28 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-03-28 | House | Report of Committee on Ways and Means agreed to. |
2017-03-28 | House | Rep. Baser of Bristol reported for the committee on Ways and Means |
2017-03-28 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-02-23 | House | Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg moved that the committee on Health Care be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Ways and Means which was agreed to. |
2017-02-22 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care |