VT H0353 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 24, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 24, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to pharmacy benefit management
Title
An act relating to pharmacy benefit management
Sponsors
Rep. Mari Cordes [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - Senate - Roll Call, requested by Senator Collamore, Passed -- Needed 14 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 24, Nays = 4 (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 24, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Signed by Governor on May 24, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 18, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-11 | House | Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2022-05-11 | House | Rules suspended and taken up for immediate consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2022-05-11 | House | Notice Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-10 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Proposal of amendment not agreed to |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment offered by Senator(s) Cummings |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Cummings |
2022-05-10 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senator Cummings explained vote |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Roll Call, requested by Senator Collamore, Passed -- Needed 14 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 24, Nays = 4 |
2022-05-09 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Hooker for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-03-23 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2022-03-23 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-03-22 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-03-22 | House | Report of Committee on Health Care agreed to |
2022-03-22 | House | Rep. Durfee of Shaftsbury recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-03-22 | House | Rep. Cordes of Lincoln reported for the Committee on Health Care |
2022-03-22 | House | Read Second time |
2022-03-22 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-03-17 | House | Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg moved to postpone action until March 22, 2022 which was agreed to |
2022-03-17 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-03-16 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-03-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2022-03-15 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2021-02-25 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Health Care |