VT H0347 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 22, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the State Telecommunications Plan

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the State Telecommunications Plan

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on May 22, 2017
2017-05-22HouseSigned by Governor on May 22, 2017
2017-05-17HouseDelivered to the Governor on May 17, 2017
2017-05-05SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
2017-05-04HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2017-05-04HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2017-05-04HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment considered
2017-05-02HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2017-05-02SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2017-05-02SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2017-05-02SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-05-01Senate3rd reading ordered
2017-05-01SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to
2017-05-01SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sirotkin for Committee on Finance
2017-05-01SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
2017-05-01SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2017-04-28SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
2017-03-23SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance
2017-03-22HouseRead Third time and Passed
2017-03-21HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-03-21HouseRep. Sibilia of Dover reported for the committee on Energy and Technology
2017-03-21HouseRead Second Time
2017-02-21HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Energy and Technology

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback