VT H0333 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 11, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to identification of gender-free restrooms in public buildings and places of public accommodation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to identification of gender-free restrooms in public buildings and places of public accommodation

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-11SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on May 11, 2018
2018-05-11HouseSigned by Governor on May 11, 2018
2018-05-07HouseDelivered to the Governor on May 7, 2018
2018-04-26SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
2018-04-24HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2018-04-24HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment considered
2018-04-19HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-04-18SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Balint, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0
2018-04-18SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-04-17Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-04-17SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs agreed to
2018-04-17SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Balint for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2018-04-17SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2018-04-17SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-04-13SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2018-04-13SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-01-03SenateReferred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs per Temporary Senate Rule 44A
2017-04-26SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules
2017-04-25HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2017-04-25HousePassed
2017-04-25HouseRead Third time
2017-04-21HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 123, Nays = 19
2017-04-21HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-04-21HouseWhich was agreed to
2017-04-21HouseRep. Strong of Albany asked leave to withdraw motion
2017-04-21HouseRep. Strong of Albany moved to amend the bill
2017-04-21HouseReport of Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs agreed to.
2017-04-21HouseRep. Gonzalez of Winooski reported for the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs
2017-04-21HouseRead Second Time
2017-02-21HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback