VT H0327 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to automatic renewal contract provisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to automatic renewal contract provisions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2019-03-12HousePassed
2019-03-12HouseRead Third time
2019-03-01HouseThird Reading Ordered
2019-03-01HouseReport of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development as amended agreed to
2019-03-01HouseReport of the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development amended as offered by Rep. Marcotte of Coventry
2019-03-01HouseRep. Marcotte of Coventry reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development
2019-03-01HouseRead Second Time
2019-02-21HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback