VT H0308 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 31, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the Racial Disparities in the Criminal and Juvenile Justice System Advisory Panel

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the Racial Disparities in the Criminal and Juvenile Justice System Advisory Panel

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on May 31, 2017
2017-05-31HouseSigned by Governor on May 31, 2017
2017-05-25HouseDelivered to the Governor on May 25, 2017
2017-05-01HouseSenate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
2017-05-01SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2017-05-01SenateHouse proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in
2017-05-01SenateHouse proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text
2017-05-01SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2017-04-28SenateHouse message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment
2017-04-28SenateHouse proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment
2017-04-27HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2017-04-27HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Morris of Bennington
2017-04-27HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment considered
2017-04-26HouseRep. Conquest of Newbury moved to postpone action until April 27, 2017 which was agreed to
2017-04-25HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2017-04-21SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2017-04-21SenateMotion agreed to
2017-04-21SenatePending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) Sears
2017-04-21SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears
2017-04-21SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-04-20Senate3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0
2017-04-20SenateProposal of amendment  by Committee on Judiciary, as amended, agreed to
2017-04-20SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations
2017-04-20SenateReported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment
2017-04-20SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Judiciary
2017-04-20SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2017-04-20SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2017-04-20SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2017-04-19SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2017-04-19SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2017-04-17SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2017-04-17SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-30SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-28HouseRead Third time and Passed
2017-03-24HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-03-24HouseReport of Committee on Judiciary agreed to.
2017-03-24HouseRep. Hooper of Montpelier recommended for the committee on Appropriations
2017-03-24HouseRep. Lalonde of South Burlington reported for the committee on Judiciary
2017-03-24HouseRead Second Time
2017-03-21HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2017-02-17HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback