VT H0297 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 10, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to miscellaneous court operations procedures

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to miscellaneous court operations procedures

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on May 10, 2017
2017-05-10HouseSigned by Governor on May 10, 2017
2017-04-13HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2017-04-13HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment considered
2017-04-11HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2017-04-07SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2017-04-06Senate3rd reading ordered
2017-04-06SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2017-04-06SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Ashe for Committee on Judiciary
2017-04-07SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-04-06SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2017-04-06SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2017-04-05SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2017-04-05SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2017-04-04SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-03SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-02HouseRead Third time and Passed
2017-03-01HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-03-01HouseWhich was agreed to
2017-03-01HouseRep. Jessup of Middlesex moved to amend the report of the committee on Judiciary
2017-03-01HouseRep. Jessup of Middlesex reported for the committee on Judiciary
2017-03-01HouseRead Second Time
2017-02-16HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback