VT H0297 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the sale of ivory or rhinoceros horn
Title
An act relating to the sale of ivory or rhinoceros horn
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-19 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 139 to Pass -- Yeas = 135, Nays = 4 (Y: 135 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | Senate | House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed |
2016-04-26 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2016-04-26 | House | Speaker appointed McCullough of Williston, Sheldon of Middlebury and Lefebvre of Newark as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2016-04-26 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. McCullough of Williston |
2016-04-21 | House | Senate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Motion agreed to |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Baruth motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Pending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sirotkin |
2016-04-20 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2016-04-19 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing & General Affairs agreed to |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Baruth for Committee on Economic Development, Housing & General Affairs |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing & General Affairs |
2016-04-19 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing & General Affairs |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Committee on Natural Resources & Energy relieved; bill committed to Committee on Economic Development, Housing & General Affairs on motion of Senator Bray |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources & Energy |
2016-02-19 | House | Passed |
2016-02-19 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 139 to Pass -- Yeas = 135, Nays = 4 |
2016-02-19 | House | Read Third time |
2016-02-19 | House | Which was agreed to |
2016-02-19 | House | Rep. Brennan of Colchester moved to amend the bill |
2016-02-18 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2016-02-18 | House | Report of Committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources agreed to. |
2016-02-18 | House | Rep. McCullough of Williston reported for the committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources |
2016-02-18 | House | Read Second Time |
2015-02-24 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources |