VT H0287 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 19, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 19, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to patient financial assistance policies and medical debt protection
Title
An act relating to patient financial assistance policies and medical debt protection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 19, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Signed by Governor on May 19, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 13, 2022 |
2022-05-02 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2022-04-29 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Hooker for Committee on Health and Welfare, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-04-26 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-03-18 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2022-03-18 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-03-17 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-03-17 | House | Report of Committee on Health Care agreed to |
2022-03-17 | House | Rep. Black of Essex reported for the Committee on Health Care |
2022-03-17 | House | Read Second time |
2022-03-17 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-03-16 | House | Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg moved to postpone action until March 17, 2022 which was agreed to |
2022-03-16 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-03-15 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2021-02-18 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Health Care |