VT H0266 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 11, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 11, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to health insurance coverage for hearing aids
Title
An act relating to health insurance coverage for hearing aids
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 11, 2022 |
2022-05-11 | House | Signed by Governor on May 11, 2022 |
2022-05-05 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 5, 2022 |
2022-05-02 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-04-29 | House | Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2022-04-29 | House | Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-04-28 | House | Notice Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-04-27 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-04-27 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Westman for Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-04-25 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |
2022-03-17 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2022-03-17 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-03-16 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-03-16 | House | Report of Committee on Health Care as amended agreed to |
2022-03-16 | House | Rep. Goldman of Rockingham moved to amend the report of the Committee on Health Care, which was agreed to |
2022-03-16 | House | Rep. Goldman of Rockingham reported for the Committee on Health Care |
2022-03-16 | House | Read Second time |
2022-03-16 | House | Action Calendar: Amendment offered by Rep Goldman of Rockingham |
2022-03-16 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-03-15 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2021-02-16 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Health Care |