VT H0254 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 23, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to adequate shelter for livestock

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to adequate shelter for livestock

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-23SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on June 23, 2020
2020-06-23HouseSigned by Governor on June 23, 2020
2020-06-18HouseDelivered to the Governor on June 18, 2020
2020-06-12HouseSenate Message, Passed in Concurrence
2020-06-10SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2020-06-10SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence
2020-06-10SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2020-06-09SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2020-06-08SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2020-06-04SenateReported favorably by Senator Hardy for Committee on Agriculture, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
2020-06-05SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2020-06-04SenateFavorable report by Committee on Agriculture
2020-06-04SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2020-06-03SenateFavorable report by Committee on Agriculture
2020-06-03SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-03-10SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Agriculture
2020-02-27HouseRead Third time and Passed
2020-02-26HouseThird Reading Ordered
2020-02-26HouseReport of Committee on Agriculture and Forestry agreed to.
2020-02-26HouseRep. Norris of Shoreham reported for the committee on Agriculture and Forestry
2020-02-26HouseRead Second Time
2019-02-15HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback