VT H0235 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-8-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Agriculture
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to repealing the sunset of the authority to conduct on-farm slaughter

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to repealing the sunset of the authority to conduct on-farm slaughter

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Agriculture
2019-03-20HouseRead Third time and Passed
2019-03-19HouseThird Reading Ordered
2019-03-19HouseReport of Committee on Agriculture and Forestry agreed to.
2019-03-19HouseRep. Fegard of Berkshire reported for the committee on Agriculture and Forestry
2019-03-19HouseRead Second Time
2019-02-14HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback