VT H0235 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-8-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Agriculture
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Agriculture
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to repealing the sunset of the authority to conduct on-farm slaughter
Title
An act relating to repealing the sunset of the authority to conduct on-farm slaughter
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2019-03-20 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2019-03-19 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-03-19 | House | Report of Committee on Agriculture and Forestry agreed to. |
2019-03-19 | House | Rep. Fegard of Berkshire reported for the committee on Agriculture and Forestry |
2019-03-19 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-02-14 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry |